Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:24-cv-03112
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2024 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Claudia Baer
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bailey Boyd
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Catholic Charities of Southern Missouri, Inc.
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Diocese of Springfield - Cape Girardeau
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Frye
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jill Guise
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Holt Long
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ken Palermo
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bishop Edward M. Rice
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Maura Taylor
Represented By
Ellen Catherine Rudolph
Lathrop Gpm LLC
contact info
Bridget B. Romero
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Farmer de la Torre
1330 S. Maryland Ave.
Springfield, MO 65807

GPO Jan 15 2025
ORDER sustaining without prejudice 11 motion to dismiss party; granting 13 motion to dismiss party; granting 18 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff has 14 days to file an Amended Complaint pursuant to this Order. Signed on 01/15/2025 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Rotellini, Michael)

Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
67 67 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 05/15 9:10 AM
ORDER granting66 motion for extension of time. Defendant Catholic Charities of Southern Missouri, Inc. may file its responses and objections to Plaintiff's first discovery requests on or before June 4, 2025. Signed on 05/15/2025 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (MAR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
66 66 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/14 4:18 PM
MOTION for extension of time to Serve Discovery Responses and Objections filed by Ellen Catherine Rudolph on behalf of Catholic Charities of Southern Missouri, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/28/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rudolph, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
65 65 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Fri 05/09 9:22 AM
PRO SE REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re55 MOTION for leave to designate expert witness on behalf of Plaintiff John Farmer de la Torre. Related [+] (KSS)
Related: [-] 55
64 64 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Fri 05/09 9:18 AM
PRO SE REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re56 MOTION for protective order on behalf of Plaintiff John Farmer de la Torre. Related [+] (KSS)
Related: [-] 56
63 63 notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/09 9:11 AM
NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by John Farmer de la Torre re54 Amended Complaint. (KSS)
Related: [-]