v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Mark D Clarke |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00672 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 5:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
MacMillan, Scholz & Marks LLC 4640 S Macadam Avenue Suite 100
Portland, OR 97239 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
USPS
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 9:38 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (MacMillan, John) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 9:36 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to USPS. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (hm) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/19 11:49 AM
Amended Proposed Summons Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (MacMillan, John) |
|
2 | 2
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Fri 04/19 9:05 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/19/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/16/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/16/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm) |
|
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 04/19 9:10 AM
Scheduling Order regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order,2 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 8/19/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 9/16/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 4:45 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9376395 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against USPS. (MacMillan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |