Alanafaay v. Mayorkas et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Adrienne Nelson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00670 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 1:24-cv-00907 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 5:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
in his official capacity, Attorney General U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ali Naser Hatef Alanafaay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Thu 04/18 3:59 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Adrienne Nelson. NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of Maryland. Our records indicate that one or more attorneys appearing on the case are not admitted to practice or are admitted only pro hac vice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by[LINK:LR 83] , and information about the process is available on the[LINK:admissions page] of the Court website. (eo) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 04/18 3:58 PM
Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:24-cv-00907. Electronic file received. |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Change or Transfer Venue
Thu 04/18 3:52 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Transfer Case; this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon; directing the Clerk to close this case in the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/18/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Change/Transfer Venue
Thu 04/18 9:44 AM
Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas(Richardson, Cathy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/18 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy Richardson on behalf of All Defendants (Richardson, Cathy) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 PAPERLESS ORDER denying2 admission pro hac vice of Sadaf F. Ahmed. Proposed admittee currently exceeds the admission limitations under Local Rule 101.1.b.iii. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/1/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sadaf F. Ahmed (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11172174.) by ALI NASER HATEF ALANAFAAY(Taylor, Dawn) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11172138.), filed by Ali Naser Hatef Alanafaay.(Taylor, Dawn) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet COVER SHEET, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Mayorkas, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Jaddou, | ||
Att: 4 Summons US ATTY, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Atty Gen, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. A, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. B |