Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:24-bk-10826
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 23, 2024

Debtor
Essential Associates Holdings LLC
343 W Erie St Ste 230
Chicago, IL 60654-5735
Represented By
Evan T. Miller
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Paige Noelle Topper
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
George L. Miller
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 05/19/2024 4:15 PM EDT
Thursday, April 18, 2024
1 1 misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/18 6:14 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Amount Paid $338. Filed by Essential Associates Holdings LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 05/20/2024 (Miller, Evan)
Related: [-]