Corrigan v. Yard House USA, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01629 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Yard House USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Corrigan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Wed 05/01 5:04 PM
Clerk's Notation re4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 4:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yard House USA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Darden Restaurants, Inc., Other Affiliate GMRI, Inc. for Yard House USA, Inc.. (Sheridan, Kimberly) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
30+
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 4:26 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/18/2024. (lme) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 04/18 8:34 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Yard House USA, Inc. Discovery ends on 9/16/2024. Filed in Cobb County State Court on 2/29/2024 (ajw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 8:31 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13370264) filed by Yard House USA, Inc..(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - General Civil/Dom Relations Case Filing Form (state court), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Process Server, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Leave of Absence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Answer of Yard House USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7- Rule 5.2 Certificate of Discovery, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Leave of Absence of Kimberly Sheridan, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Uniform Superior Court Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiffs responses to requests for admissions, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet |