Kinsale Insurance Company v. Quarry Apartments LLC et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01630 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Eddie Burns
|
|
Defendant
Quarry Apartments LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kinsale Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Leave of Absence
Mon 04/22 12:46 PM
Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Thursday, May 30 through and including Friday, May 31, 2024; Monday, June 3 through and including Friday, June 7, 2024; Monday, June 10 through and including Tuesday, June 11, 2024; Friday, July 5, 2024; Monday, July 8 through and including Tuesday, July 9, 2024; Thursday, August 22 through and including Friday, August 23, 2024; Monday, August 26 through and including Wednesday, August 28, 2024, by Diego Cardenas. (Cardenas, Diego) |
|
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Mon 04/22 11:12 AM
Clerk's notation re: ECF4 ; no conflicts identified. Approved by Judge Grimberg. (dnb) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 8:39 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kinsale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Kinsale Capital Group for Kinsale Insurance Company. (Cardenas, Diego) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
30+
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 10:32 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/18/2024. (tas) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 8:54 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Quarry Apartments LLC. (bmr) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13370474)(bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |