A.M. et al v. SouthState Bank, N.A.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01636 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
SouthState Bank, N.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
A.M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R.M.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 11:58 AM
ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lucy McShane. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/25/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/25 12:00 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Lucy McShane re7 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkb) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Wed 04/24 1:16 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Lucy McShane Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13381071). Attorney Lucy McShane added appearing on behalf of A.M., A.M., M.M., R.M.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 8:50 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Lucy McShane Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13381071).by A.M., A.M., M.M., R.M..(Zinns, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Court Admissions of Lucy McShane | ||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 1:52 PM
ORDER, by docket entry only, granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/23/24. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Mon 04/22 2:28 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Maurreen M. Brady Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13376068). Attorney Maureen M. Brady added appearing on behalf of A.M., A.M., M.M., R.M.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 1:07 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Maurreen M. Brady Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13376068).by A.M., A.M., M.M., R.M..(Zinns, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Court Admissions of Maureen M. Brady | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter re:83.1
Thu 04/18 11:17 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Lucy McShane. Clerk to follow-up by 4/29/2024. (esr) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter re:83.1
Thu 04/18 11:00 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Maureen M. Brady. Clerk to follow-up by 4/29/2024. (esr) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 9:29 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to SouthState Bank, N.A.. (gww) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13370718) filed by A.M.(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), R.M., M.M..(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |