v. O'MALLEY
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Referred: | Joe L Webster |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00338 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Application to Proceed IFP
Mon 04/22 1:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 04/22/2024, that the plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. [28 U.S.C. 1915(a)]. The Court will apply the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk's Office is directed to issue a Notice of Service pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) effective December 1, 2022. (cc) |
|
misc
Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case
Mon 04/22 1:18 PM
Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 6/21/2024. (cc) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Fri 04/19 2:06 PM
Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (cc) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 04/19 2:06 PM
Motions Referred: RE:1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (cc) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Amanda Griffin, filed by Amanda Griffin.(DALTON, AARON) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed IFP
Thu 04/18 5:29 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed IFP () by Amanda Griffin. (DALTON, AARON) |