Gray v. Mt. Moriah Auto Sales et al
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jon Phipps Mccalla |
Referred: | Charmiane G Claxton |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02245 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mt. Moriah Auto Sales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert L. Gray
3835 Buckley Cove
Bartlett, TN 38133 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Scott Martin
Terminated: 04/24/2024
|
|
Defendant
Eddie Walker
Terminated: 04/24/2024
|
|
Defendant
Lonnie Webb
Terminated: 04/24/2024
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, February 21, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER granting21 Motion to Appoint a New Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 2/21/2025. (Claxton, Charmiane) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MOTION for court to appoint mediator in court proceeding by Robert L. Gray. (jae) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of filing Employment Records Release Authorization by Robert L. Gray(jae) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting in part and denying in part18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 2/10/2025. (Claxton, Charmiane) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Pro Se Complaint and Join Parties, by Robert L. Gray. (jae) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of filing initial disclosures by Robert L. Gray. (jae) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() SETTING LETTER: A JURY TRIAL has been SET before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla for TUESDAY, JANUARY 20, 2026 at 9:30 A.M. (CT) in a courtroom to be determined in the Odell Horton Federal Building. A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE will be held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on FRIDAY, JANUARY 9, 2026 at 10:30 A.M. (CT) in courtroom 7 of the Odell Horton Federal Building. A PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER must be furnished to the Court by 4:30 P.M. (CT) on DECEMBER 29, 2025. (jrs) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 11/22 2:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton: Scheduling Conference held on 11/22/2024. Pro Se Plaintiff present. Counsel for the defendants present. Proposed Scheduling Order submitted. The Court reviewed the deadlines with the parties. The matter is a Jury Trial expected to last 3/5 days. The Court appointed Mediator Robert Clerk from the panel. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Pro Se. Defendants Counsel: Erica Johnson.) (Tape #FTR CR5.) (cas) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ORDER Appointing Mediator and Waiving Pro Se Plaintiff's Pro Rata Portion of the Mediator's Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 11/22/2024. (Claxton, Charmiane) |
|
13 | 13
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 11/22/2024. (Claxton, Charmiane) |
|
12 | 12
![]() AGREEMENT TO RECEIVE NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING by Robert L. Gray (jae) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF SETTING: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE has been set for FRIDAY, 11/22/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. (bvh) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Erica N Johnson on behalf of Mt. Moriah Auto Sales (Johnson, Erica) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by Mt. Moriah Auto Sales.(Day, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Gray as to Lisa Jo Lundine, Registered Agent for Mt. Moriah Auto Sales. (mlk) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Mt. Moriah Auto Sales. Summons (2), USM 285, copy of complaint and order placed in USM's inneroffice mail for service. (jae) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER Granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert L. Gray and to Issue and Effect Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 4/23/2024. (Claxton, Charmiane) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerks Referral to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/22 2:36 PM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
ADR Compliance
Thu 04/18 1:36 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Thu 04/18 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert L. Gray. (csf) |
|
1 | 1
![]() PRO SE COMPLAINT Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 2000ra against All Defendants, filed by Robert L. Gray.(csf) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |