Hill (PS) v. Bradshaw et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01049 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 9:27 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 04/19/2024. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order . If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (ECF No.2 ) is denied.(pklin, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/18 3:31 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 3:29 PM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Deddrick Hill. (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 3:27 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against Bradshaw, Haughmen, filed by Deddrick Hill. (blaws) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |