California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00764
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 12:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Armando Sanchez Salcido (1)
Represented By
Nicholas DePento
Law Offices Of Nicholas Depento
contact info
Lisa Kadenge Muloma
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Melanie K. Pierson
U S Attorneys Office
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Jun 06 2024
JUDGMENT as to Armando Sanchez Salcido (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP for Time Served, 1 year supervised release, $100 special assessment remitted, and fine waived; Count(s) 2, Dismissed on Government's oral motion. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro (jpp)

Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 2:05 AM PDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
Arrest of Armando Sanchez Salcido (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Armando Sanchez Salcido.(fjp) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/28/2024) (fjp). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Armando Sanchez Salcido: Initial Appearance set for 3/28/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lisa Kadenge Muloma appearing for Armando Sanchez Salcido (Muloma, Lisa)Attorney Lisa Kadenge Muloma added to party Armando Sanchez Salcido(pty:dft) (rxc). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Armando Sanchez Salcido (Muloma, Lisa) (rxc). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Initial Appearance as to Armando Sanchez Salcido held on 3/28/2024. Oral proffer; Court provisionally Appointed Federal Defenders for Armando Sanchez Salcido. Financial Affidavit due no later than 4/11/2024. No Bond set as to Armando Sanchez Salcido (1) - Govt's oral motion to detain (RF). Detention Hearing as to Armando Sanchez Salcido held on 3/28/2024. USA oral motion for detention - granted. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/11/2024 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Arraignment set for 4/25/2024 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Rule 5 advisal provided. (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 3/28/2024 JLB 206-243). (Plaintiff Attorney Joel Doolin, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Marina Henri, FD s/a). (dls) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Armando Sanchez Salcido (no document attached) (dls) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER as to Armando Sanchez Salcido: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/28/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Armando Sanchez Salcido. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/28/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Melanie K. Pierson appearing for USA. (Pierson, Melanie)Attorney Melanie K. Pierson added to party USA(pty:pla) (stn). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Pierson, Melanie) (stn). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
11 11 NOTICE of Lodgment of Plea Agreement by USA (Pierson, Melanie) (stn). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Lodgment by USA Consent to Plea before Magistrate Judge (Pierson, Melanie) (stn). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
13 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armando Sanchez Salcido. (DePento, Nicholas)Attorney Nicholas DePento added to party Armando Sanchez Salcido(pty:dft) (axi). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Armando Sanchez Salcido. Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/16/2024 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Sentence Without PSR set for 4/16/2024 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (no document attached) (als) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lisa Kadenge Muloma terminated as to Armando Sanchez Salcido (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 4/9/2024.(axi) (sjt). [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Armando Sanchez Salcido. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/11/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Arraignment reset for 4/16/2024 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (als) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Armando Sanchez Salcido. Defense oral motion to continue hearing is granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 4/16/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (Interpreter Rodolfo Martinez). (CD# 4/11/2024 BLM 24:933-935). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello, S/A AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Nicholas DePento, RET). (nbp) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
18 18 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): 4/16/2024 Change of Plea and Sentencing vacated (no document attached) (als) [3:24-mj-01247-JLB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
19 19 INFORMATION as to Armando Sanchez Salcido (1) count(s) 1-2. (als)
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Arraignment on Information as to Armando Sanchez Salcido (1) Count 1-2 held on 4/16/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/24/2024 09:00 AM before District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (Interpreter Mylene Green). (CD# 4/16/2024 JLB 24: 9:55-9:58). (Plaintiff Attorney Joel Doolin, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Nicholas DePento). (als)
Related: [-]