Stratton v. Miller
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Stacie F Beckerman |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00667 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Mon 04/29 9:15 AM
ORDER: The Court DENIES Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No.1 ) and ORDERS Petitioner to submit the $5.00 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. The Court advises Petitioner that failure to submit the filing fee shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 4/26/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Jaime Stratton, Prisoner ID: 11006322) (dino) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Thu 04/18 4:16 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. **3 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Jaime Stratton, Prisoner ID: 11006322.) (bd) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 04/18 4:14 PM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jaime Michelle Stratton. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jaime Stratton, Prisoner ID: 11006322.) (bd) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Petition - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Thu 04/18 4:12 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). (IFP Submitted) . Filed by Jaime Michelle Stratton against Jamie Miller. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jaime Stratton, Prisoner ID: 11006322.) (bd) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Thu 04/18 4:08 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jaime Michelle Stratton. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jaime Stratton, Prisoner ID: 11006322.) (bd) |
|
Att: 1 Trust Account Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order. |