Weinberg v. PacificSource Health Plans
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Mcshane |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00673 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 1:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
PacificSource Health Plans
|
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Weinberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)
Thu 05/02 9:20 AM
Amended Complaint . Filed by Bruce Weinberg against PacificSource Health Plans. (Snyder, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 10:52 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to PacificSource Health Plans. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (le) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
service
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/23 3:39 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by Bruce Weinberg. (Snyder, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
7
pgs
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Mon 04/22 9:20 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/20/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/19/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/19/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (le) |
|
attyadm
Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 04/22 9:28 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney William Madsen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-93774422 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
motion
Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 11:58 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney William Madsen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9377442. Filed by Bruce Weinberg. (Madsen, William) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 5:04 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9376447 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Bruce Weinberg against PacificSource Health Plans. (Snyder, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |