Thomas Anderson, et al v. UAL, et al
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00989
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01626 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 4:59 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED AIRLINES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT KIRBY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRETT J. HART
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KATE GEBO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY HART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES BREITSPRECHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LORA BAUER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ELKA CAMPBELL, as personal representative of the Estate of Kevin Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID CATALA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Thomas Anderson, Lora Bauer, James Breitsprecher, Elka Campbell and David Catala by 04/23/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/01/2024. Appellants' brief due on or before 05/28/2024 for Thomas Anderson, Lora Bauer, James Breitsprecher, Elka Campbell and David Catala. [1] [7377155] 24-1626 (PS) [Entered: 04/18/2024 10:35 AM] | |
Att: 1 39 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
2 | 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: James Curtis, Nicholas Decker, Aimee Doll, Tom Floyd, Kevin Hendershot, Kenneth Locke, Brenda Mallett, Brenda Marsden, Sylvia Fitch-McConnell, Michelle Miller, John Morris, Carole O?Kobrick, Stephanie Pati, Frank Quintas, Paul Rozell, Darleen Shanley-Gilbert, Randy Sikora, Charles Snyder, John Sullivan, Doug Turner, Rhett Wolfe, James Zietlow, and Kevin Zwierko. APPELLEES: Josh Earnest, Linda JoJo, Gerald Laderman, Andrew Nocella, Janet Lamkin, Jonathan M. Roitman, John Slater, Torbjorn J. Enqvist, Theresa Fariello, Sasha Johnson, Bryan Quigley, Kirk Limacher, Edward M. Philip, Carolyn Corvi, Matthew Friend, Michael J. Hamilton, Michael Harrison, Barney Harford, Michele J. Hooper, Todd M. Insler, Walter Isaacson, Richard Johnsen, James A.C. Kennedy, Edward L. Shapiro, David J. Vitale, James M. Whitehurst, and Laysha Ward. [2] [7377160] 24-1626 (PS) [Entered: 04/18/2024 10:58 AM] |