HART et al v. TURGUNBAEV et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Bissoon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 10:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
SUN EXPRESS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
GANIDJON TURGUNBAEV
|
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATRICIA HART
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Mon 04/22 12:24 PM
Disclosure Statement declaring citizenship by MICHAEL HART, PATRICIA HART. (Rudert, Erin) Modified text on 4/22/2024. (kss) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 12:14 PM
ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/22/2024. (jmm) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to SUN EXPRESS, INC., GANIDJON TURGUNBAEV (kss) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Turgunbaev | ||
misc
QC - Attorney Signature Deficient QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 9:01 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information (Pennsylvania or other state bar identification number). CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)).(Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2024.) (kss) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Fri 04/19 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT against SUN EXPRESS, INC., GANIDJON TURGUNBAEV (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8224503), filed by MICHAEL HART, PATRICIA HART. (Rudert, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/22 8:56 AM
Judge Cathy Bissoon added. (kss) |