BELL v. VANDERHALL
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Zachary C Bolitho |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00165 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT ESCAMBIA COUNTY, 2024CC002158 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 11:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
TAKAYLA VANDERHALL
|
|
Plaintiff
IVAN BELL
|
Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 11:33 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb) | |
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re:1 Notice of Removal,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb) | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TAKAYLA VANDERHALL. (alb) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TAKAYLA VANDERHALL, filed by TAKAYLA VANDERHALL. (No service copies.) (alb) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement, | ||
Att: 4 Answer. |