Petrucci v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00728 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/01 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Helen M. Petrucci. (Boyd, Bradley) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 05/01 4:09 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Helen M. Petrucci. Related case(s): Yes (Boyd, Bradley) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of substitution of AUSA
Mon 04/29 1:22 PM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. Ellen Veronica Abt substituting for Nadine DeLuca Elder. (Abt, Ellen) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 2:09 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-728-RMN. (RLK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/19 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bradley K. Boyd on behalf of Helen Marie Petrucci. Lead Counsel: Bradley K Boyd. (Boyd, Bradley) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22001769). The plaintiff CONSENTS to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Helen Marie Petrucci.(Boyd, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |