Allen v. O'Malley
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederick J Scullin, Jr |
Referred: | Therese Wiley Dancks |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00539 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Tue 04/23 7:21 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Vernon Norwood appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/22/2024. (Norwood, Vernon) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/22 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Leon Allen: The Court having considered Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 it is hereby ORDERED, that the application is GRANTED. **Plaintiff should note that, although the application to proceed in forma pauperis has been granted, Plaintiff will still be required to pay fees that Plaintiff incurs in this action, including copying and/or witness fees. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/22/2024. (sg) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Fri 04/19 9:26 AM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . (hmr) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Fri 04/19 9:25 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Leon Allen advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (hmr) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 9:23 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leon Allen. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (hmr) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Fri 04/19 9:16 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (hmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Fri 04/19 9:14 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(hmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Unfavorable ALJ Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Appeals Council Denial, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Extension of Time to File Civil Action, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |