EASYGROUP LTD v. ER TRAVEL, LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David S Leibowitz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60638 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 12:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
ER TRAVEL, LLC
a Florida limited liability company 100 S.E. 20th Street
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316 |
|
Defendant
PAUL HANLEY
an individual 1508 S.W. 28th Street
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33315 |
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY KOEHLER
an individual 500 S.E. 6th Street Suite 102A
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 |
|
Plaintiff
EASYGROUP LTD
a United Kingdom corporation c/o GrayRobinson, P.A. 333 S.E. 2nd Avenue Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 05/03 11:29 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document ER TRAVEL, LLC. Response/Answer due 6/24/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
14 | 14
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 05/03 11:26 AM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Fri 05/03 11:24 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/16/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning/Transferring Case - NEW District Judge
Thu 05/02 11:17 AM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge David S. Leibowitz for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (yar) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 05/01 1:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by ER TRAVEL, LLC. Attorney Matthew Scott Nelles added to party ER TRAVEL, LLC(pty:dft). (Nelles, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 2:53 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by EASYGROUP LTD (Espinosa, Jorge) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Mon 04/29 1:30 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. Johnson & Martin, P.A.. (cds) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 1:23 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by EASYGROUP LTD (Espinosa, Jorge) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 10:54 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by EASYGROUP LTD. ER TRAVEL, LLC served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Espinosa, Jorge) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/24 3:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EASYGROUP LTD. TIMOTHY KOEHLER waiver sent on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 6/24/2024.(Espinosa, Jorge) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver of Service of Summons for Timothy Koehler | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/24 3:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EASYGROUP LTD. PAUL HANLEY waiver sent on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 6/24/2024.(Espinosa, Jorge) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver of Service of Summons for Paul Hanley | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Fri 04/19 12:20 PM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pc) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 11:52 AM
Summons Issued as to ER TRAVEL, LLC, PAUL HANLEY, TIMOTHY KOEHLER. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 11:43 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17461932, filed by EASYGROUP LTD.(Espinosa, Jorge) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Summon(s) Summons to ER Travel, LLC, | ||
Att: 11 Summon(s) Summons to Paul Hanley, | ||
Att: 12 Summon(s) Summons to Timothy Koehler |