Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:24-bk-01916
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2024
Terminated:May 17, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tijuana Flats Restaurants, LLC
2300 Maitland Center Pkwy Ste 306
Maitland, FL 32751-7412
Represented By
Richard R Thames
Thames Markey
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Thursday, August 29, 2024
10 10 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 08/29 12:49 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 3 Filed by Creditor Manatee County Tax Collector (ML). (Manatee County Tax Collector (ML))
Related: [-]
9 9 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 08/29 12:42 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 1 Filed by Creditor Manatee County Tax Collector (ML). (Manatee County Tax Collector (ML))
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 05/17 3:04 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 misc Request for Notice Wed 04/24 8:16 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Manatee County Tax Collector (ML). (Manatee County Tax Collector (ML))
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/23 9:06 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert B Worman on behalf of Creditor Victoria Plaza, Inc.. (Worman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/22 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/22 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Transfer Case (Another DIVISION) Fri 04/19 2:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Transfer Case to Another Division. Case Transferred to Jacksonville Division Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 3 pgs order Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business Fri 04/19 1:58 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Motion to Transfer Case (Another DIVISION) Fri 04/19 1:55 PM
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/19 12:10 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Richard R Thames on behalf of Tijuana Flats Restaurants, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/19/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 08/19/2024. (Thames, Richard)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 04/19 1:04 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-01916] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A75159972, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 04/19 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]