Hayes v. Apple Inc
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Smith |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60639 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 17th Judicial Circuit in and for Broward County, F, CACE-23-018974 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Apple Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Krystle Hayes
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 2:59 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc (Adler-Paindiris, Stephanie) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/22 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit to Notice and Petition for Removal by Apple Inc re1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Adler-Paindiris, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 2:52 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Fri 04/19 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17462515, filed by Krystle Hayes. (No Motion to Dismiss filed)(Adler-Paindiris, Stephanie) Modified text on 4/19/2024 (scn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer filed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |