Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-20758

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul E Singleton
Case #: 2:24-ap-02018
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Randi Scannell, majority member of debtor
3005 Cascade Dr.
Valparaiso, IN 46383
Represented By
Randi Scannell
contact info
Plaintiff
Lori D. Fisher
P. O. Box 92
Valparaiso, IN 46384
Represented By
Sheila A. Ramacci
contact info
Sheila A. Ramacci (EW)
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
100 East Wayne Street, 5th Floor
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, September 05, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 09/06 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Judgment
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
20 20 order Judgment Tue 09/03 9:34 AM
Default Judgment Related [+].
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fishere
Friday, August 23, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance(BK) Fri 08/23 11:03 AM
Notice of Appearance by Sheila A. Ramacci (EW) Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
18 18 utility Returned Mail Mon 08/05 12:52 PM
Returned Mail Related [+]. (mjc)
Related: [-] 16 Judgment
Sunday, July 21, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Mon 07/22 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Judgment
Friday, July 19, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Fri 07/19 3:54 PM
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. (mkp). . Modified on 7/19/2024 (mfj)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher
Monday, July 08, 2024
15 15 misc Brief Mon 07/08 5:26 PM
Brief Trustee's Brief In Support of Motion For Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher Related [+] (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lori D. Fisher
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, June 22, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 06/23 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 File
Thursday, June 20, 2024
13 13 order File Thu 06/20 9:14 AM
Order Reserving Ruling on Motion for Default Judgment Until July 15, 2024 Related [+]. Documents due by 7/15/2024. (mjc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher
Saturday, June 01, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 06/02 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Randi Scannell
Thursday, May 30, 2024
11 11 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/30 9:25 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Randi Scannell . (mfj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
10 10 motion Entry of Default Fri 05/24 12:11 PM
Motion for Entry of Default Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 misc Affidavit Fri 05/24 12:07 PM
Affidavit Re: Motion for Default Judgment of Nonmilitary Service Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher Related [+] (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lori D. Fisher
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 misc Exhibit(BK) Fri 05/24 12:03 PM
Exhibit "A" Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher Related [+] (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-] 7 Affidavit of Default filed by Lori D. Fisher
7 7 misc Affidavit of Default Fri 05/24 12:02 PM
Affidavit of Default Re: Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher Related [+] (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lori D. Fisher
6 6 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/24 12:00 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Default Judgment
Monday, April 22, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/22 12:49 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher Related [+] (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Complaint
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 order Defer Payment Fri 04/19 2:21 PM
Order Related [+] in Adversary Proc. No. 2:24-ap-2018 (mkp)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/19 2:08 PM
Summons Issued on Randi Scannell Date Issued 4/19/2024, Answer Due 5/20/2024. (mkp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
2 2 motion Defer Fee(AP) Thu 04/18 4:45 PM
Application to Defer Fee in Adversary Proc. No. 2:24-ap-2018 Filed by Plaintiff Lori D. Fisher (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 3:53 PM
Adversary case 24-02018 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer),12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Lori D. Fisher against Randi Scannell. Receipt Number defer, Fee Amount $350. (Ramacci (EW), Sheila)
Related: [-]