Prout v. Costco
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Janis L Sammartino |
Referred: | Daniel E Butcher |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00703 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331va Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 14th Amendment |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 11:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Costco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin M Prout
2121 Judson
San Diego, CA 92111 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
11
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/19 10:30 AM
ORDER: (1) Ordering Plaintiff to Show Cause Why the EEOC Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Jurisdiction; (2) Severing Claims Against Costco and Terminating Costco and Costco's Motion to Dismiss in this Action; (3) Setting Schedule for Outstanding Briefing on SEIU's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/18/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply - Other
Fri 04/19 10:27 AM
REPLY - Costco Wholesale Corporation's Reply re7 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Costco.(aas) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/19 10:22 AM
ORDER Vacating Hearing on Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation's Motion to Dismiss10 and Taking the Matter Under Submission. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/31/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/19 10:15 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kevin M Prout.(aas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -Exhibit Evidence for Opposition: Exhbit of Costco's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendant Costco's5 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/3/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas) | |
5 | 5 Notice of Motion and MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Costco.(aas) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Alan B Graves, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin M Prout, as to Costco. (aas) | |
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kevin M Prout as to Costco. (aas) | |
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (aas) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Costco ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number waived.), filed by Kevin M Prout. The new case number is 3:24-cv-703-JLS-DEB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(aas) | |
Att: 1 Civil cover Sheet |