The Surrogacy Law Center et al v. Blinken et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | Barbara Lynn Major |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00705 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 11:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Colombia A. Barrosse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rena Bitter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Antony Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Surrogacy Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daria Vlasova-Milai
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order re Pro Hac Vice Application
Tue 04/23 11:58 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Gregory Romanovsky, re3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/23/2024.(exs) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 4:12 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18780902.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Romanovsky, Gregory) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 10:37 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition
Fri 04/19 10:23 AM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus against Colombia A. Barrosse, Rena Bitter, Antony Blinken ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18773504.), filed by The Surrogacy Law Center, Daria Vlasova-Milai. The new case number is 3:24-cv-705-MMA-BLM. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Schoenberg, Lori)(ggv) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits to Complaint |