CHAMPION v. SENDWELL, INC.
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | James E Boasberg |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01143 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
SENDWELL, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA CHAMPION
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Tue 04/30 4:48 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SENDWELL, INC. served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024 (Wertheim, James) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 4:22 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SENDWELL, INC..(zcb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 4:20 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Fri 04/19 2:44 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOSHUA CHAMPION. Related document:1 Complaint filed by JOSHUA CHAMPION.(Wertheim, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against SENDWELL, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10839088) filed by JOSHUA CHAMPION.(Wertheim, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |