v. Strike 3 Holdings, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John L Badalamenti |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00359 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/02 11:36 AM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Subpoena | ||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 2:00 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Civil Action Order
Fri 04/26 9:53 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/26/2024. (WRW) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/23 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christian W. Waugh on behalf of Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Lead Counsel: Christian W. Waugh. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copyright Report
Mon 04/22 10:31 AM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (EVK) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/22 9:57 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Christian W. Waugh of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 3:22 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-359-JLB-NPM. (RLK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/19 2:02 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22003054) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |