Byrd v. Brauer et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Corrigan |
Referred: | Laura Lothman Lambert |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00378 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Douglas Brauer
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Conway
|
|
Defendant
David Dagenais
|
|
Defendant
District Board of Trustees of Florida State College at Jacksonville
|
|
Defendant
Santos Torres
|
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Byrd
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/23 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John D. Webb on behalf of Bradley Byrd. Lead Counsel: John D. Webb. (Webb, John) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/22 8:18 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Fri 04/19 4:30 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Douglas Brauer, Patricia Conway, David Dagenais, District Board of Trustees of Florida State College at Jacksonville, Santos Torres. (GL) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/19 4:22 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUSNEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 12:36 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:24-cv-378-TJC-LLL. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Douglas Brauer, Patricia Conway, David Dagenais, District Board of Trustees of Florida State College at Jacksonville, Santos Torres with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22002205) filed by Bradley Byrd.(Webb, John) Modified text on 4/19/2024 (GL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Summons |