Baruah v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00729 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Camp Springs, MD 20588
|
|
Defendant
Secretary ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Washington, DC 20528
|
|
Plaintiff
Abhijit Baruah
David Stoller, PA 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/01 10:32 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Order by Abhijit Baruah. (Stoller, David) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 05/01 10:31 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Abhijit Baruah. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 05/01 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Stoller on behalf of Abhijit Baruah. Lead Counsel: David Stoller. (Stoller, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
15
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 9:28 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/24/2024. (GNB) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Fri 04/19 2:38 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (BGR) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 04/19 2:37 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (BGR) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 2:15 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-729-JSS-RMN. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22002069) filed by Abhijit Baruah.(Stoller, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Form I-765 Denial Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Form I-20, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Mayorkas, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Jaddou |