Scott v. Orange County, Florida
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00731 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Orange County, Florida
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Scott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 05/01 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 05/01 4:23 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/1/2024. (RMF) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued
Fri 04/26 10:13 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Orange County, Florida. (LNR) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/24 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bradley Abraham Tobin on behalf of Michael Scott. Lead Counsel: Bradley A Tobin. (Tobin, Bradley) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proposed summons
Wed 04/24 1:55 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Michael Scott. (Tobin, Bradley) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 2:02 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/22 9:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bradley Abraham Tobin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 2:09 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-731-WWB-DCI. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Orange County, Florida with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22002659) filed by Michael Scott.(Tobin, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |