Cohan v. An Luxury Imports of Pembroke Pines, Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80488 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
An Luxury Imports of Palm Beach, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
An Luxury Imports of Pembroke Pines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Autonation Imports of Palm Beach Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Star Motors, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 2:13 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. An Luxury Imports of Pembroke Pines, Inc. served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 2:12 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Star Motors, LLC served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 2:11 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. An Luxury Imports of Palm Beach, Inc. served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Wed 04/24 2:03 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re5 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Party Served Selected ; ERROR - The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, See DE#6. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 2:02 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Autonation Imports of Palm Beach Inc. served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024.(For Image See DE#5 ) (cds) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 1:50 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Autonation Imports of Palm Beach Inc. . served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) Modified Party Served on 4/24/2024 (cds) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/23 11:41 AM
ADA TITLE III SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Deadline 7/3/2024. Status Report due by 7/10/2024. Until the Parties file the Case Management Report, all discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided herein. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 3:10 PM
Summons Issued as to An Luxury Imports of Palm Beach, Inc., An Luxury Imports of Pembroke Pines, Inc., Autonation Imports of Palm Beach Inc., and Star Motors, LLC. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 3:07 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17462717, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s) |