Petit Bois v. North Miami Beach P.D.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Bloom |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21489 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
North Miami Beach P.D.
|
|
Plaintiff
Reginald Petit Bois
240129944 Metro West Detention Center 13850 NW 41 Street
Miami, FL 33178 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Tue 04/23 6:52 AM
ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, Dismissing Case / Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald Petit Bois. (drz) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency
Fri 04/19 1:47 PM
Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re:1 Complaint filed by Reginald Petit Bois. Civil Cover Sheet not filed pursuant to Local Rule 3.3. (drz) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 1:46 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:45 PM
COMPLAINT against North Miami Beach P.D.. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Reginald Petit Bois.(drz) |