Hudson v. Openly LLC et al
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Chad W Bryan |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00235 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Tallapoosa County, CV-24-900026 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Openly LLC
Hill, Hill, Carter, Franco, Cole & Black P.O. Box 116
Montgomery, AL 36101 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rock Ridge Insurance Company
Hill, Hill, Carter, Franco, Cole & Black P.O. Box 116
Montgomery, AL 36101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Wayne Henderson on behalf of Openly LLC, Rock Ridge Insurance Company (Henderson, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/30 3:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Openly LLC, Rock Ridge Insurance Company. (Allred, David) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 2:10 PM
ORDER: The parties are hereby DIRECTED to complete and return the appropriate form so that it is received by the Clerk of Court on or before May 6, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 4/22/2024. (Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record) (LAB) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge. (LAB) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 12:01 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan as Presiding Judge. (LAB) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 10:39 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rock Ridge Insurance Company. (Allred, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 10:39 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Openly LLC. (Allred, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tallapoosa County, case number CV-2024-900026. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3626930) , filed by Rock Ridge Insurance Company, Openly LLC. (Allred, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - RoS (Rock Ridge), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Openly Ann Rpt, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "D-1" - Adriel Nunes, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit "D-2" - Robert Higgins, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit "D-3" - Tyree Harris, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit "E" - Rock Ridge SoS, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit "F" - ATA Est, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit "G" - Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Rock Ridge Insurance Company, filed by Rock Ridge Insurance Company, Openly LLC.( 1 - 1) (LAB) |