Williams v. Bynum (INMATE 2)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | Charles S Coody |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00234 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/02 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Irby Cuthbert on behalf of Mason Bynum (Cuthbert, Laura) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/02 12:16 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mason Bynum. (Cuthbert, Laura) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 05/02 11:11 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and2 Order signed by Sandra Blackman for Steven T. Marshall, Attorney General on 04/29/2024. (GGN) |
|
3 | 3
service
Return Receipt Card
Mon 04/29 2:33 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of1 Petition and2 Order signed by Steve Brown for Mason Bynum served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (GGN) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 04/23 8:14 AM
ORDER: the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of the Petition with all attachments (Doc. 1 ), to Sheriff Mason Bynum and the Attorney General for the State of Alabama. An answer must be filed with the Court and served upon Petitioner by May 14, 2024, as further set out in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 04/23/24. (furn: as directed)(GGN) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/19 2:04 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt number 4782.), filed by Thomas C. Williams.(TPS) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt |