Jones v. Payne et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Referred: | Benecia B Moore |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00345 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 05/03 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Keithen L Jones. (cmn) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/30 9:23 AM
ORDER directing Jones to file a notice of his current mailing address within 30 days of the date of this Order, if he wishes to continue pursuing this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 4/30/2024. (kdr) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/29 2:18 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Keithen L Jones re3 Notice of Docket Correction re2 Complaint, Notice of Docket Correction re2 Complaint. (fjg) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Mon 04/22 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 04/19 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was filed in error (missing envelope) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The envelope was added to docket entry2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Keithen L Jones. (llg) (jak) |
|
Att: 1 (4/19/2024) Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 12:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (llg) |