HFSC VII, LLC v. ZUERCHER et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21492 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
JJJBT, INC.
25400 East 152nd Avenue
Brighton, CO 80603 |
|
Defendant
BRADLEY W ZUERCHER
25400 East 152nd Avenue
Brighton, CO 80603 |
|
Defendant
THERESE K ZUERCHER
25400 East 152nd Avenue
Brighton, CO 80603 |
|
Plaintiff
HFSC VII, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 11:22 AM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) by HFSC VII, LLC identifying Corporate Parent HEICO Flight Support Corporation for HFSC VII, LLC (Altman, Jennifer) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 9:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Ryan R. Adelsperger is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff HFSC VII, LLC for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Ryan R. Adelsperger at ryan.adelsperger@pillsburylaw.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 9:46 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Mark D. Litvack is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff HFSC VII, LLC for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Litvack at mark.litvack@pillsburylaw.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Sun 04/21 2:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. On or before May 13, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a disclosure pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) identifying the citizenship of each of its members. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
6 | 6
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Sun 04/21 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 04/19 5:21 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ryan R. Adelsperger. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17464247 by HFSC VII, LLC. Responses due by 5/3/2024.(Altman, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Ryan R Adelsperger | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 04/19 5:18 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark D. Litvack. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17464243 by HFSC VII, LLC. Responses due by 5/3/2024.(Altman, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Mark D. Litvack | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 4:56 PM
Summons Issued as to JJJBT, INC., BRADLEY W ZUERCHER, THERESE K ZUERCHER. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 4:48 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17463102, filed by HFSC VII, LLC.(Altman, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plea Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) - Bradley W Zuercher, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) - Therese K Zuercher, | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s) - JJJBT, Inc. |