Cohan v. Lake Worth Property Enterprises, LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80489 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Boca Gas & Go Corp
|
|
Defendant
Lake Worth Property Enterprises, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 1:00 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Boca Gas & Go Corp served on 4/29/2024, response/answer due 5/20/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 9:16 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Lake Worth Property Enterprises, LLC served on 4/25/2024, response/answer due 5/16/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/23 8:34 AM
ADA TITLE III SCHEDULING ORDER Mediation Deadline 7/8/2024. Status Report due by 7/15/2024. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 2:56 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Boca Gas & Go Corp, Lake Worth Property Enterprises, LLC. (scn) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 3:38 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17462951, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) |