California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-03234
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2024
Terminated:Jul 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Allied Collection Services of California, LLC
Plaintiff
Sophia De La Torre
Represented By
Neda Farah
Farah Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, July 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/16 10:08 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a notice of settlement on July 12, 2024. This action is therefore dismissed in its entirety without prejudice, and the August 2 mandatory scheduling conference is vacated. (see document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
12 12 notice Settlement Fri 07/12 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sophia De La Torre. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 06/03 2:23 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on August 2, 2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINE TO FILE A JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/28 5:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sophia De La Torre. upon Allied Collection Services of California, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/20/2024, answer due 7/19/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Marc S. Bender. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sun 04/21 12:23 PM
Civil standing order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/19 3:49 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Allied Collection Services of California, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/19 3:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/19 3:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/19 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/19 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sophia De La Torre, (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 04/19 11:55 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Sophia De La Torre. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/19 11:50 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sophia De La Torre. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/19 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37317750 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Sophia De La Torre. (Attorney Neda Farah added to party Sophia De La Torre(pty:pla))(Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]