Subasic v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 0:15-md-02666
Lead case: 0:15-md-02666
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01443 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2024 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Subasic
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hulse on behalf of All Defendants. (Hulse, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case
Fri 04/19 4:08 PM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/mdl-cases] . (LTT) |
|
4 | 4
![]() MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(LTT) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (LTT) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/19 4:05 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-1443 JNE/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Joseph Subasic against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10990757) filed by Joseph Subasic. Filer requests summons issued. (Assaad, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |