Johnson v. Glasgow
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Debra M Brown |
Referred: | Jane M Virden |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00040 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Coahoma County, Mississippi, 14CO1:24cv003 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:14 PM CDT |
Defendant
Stephen Glasgow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Order - Rule 16.1
Fri 04/19 4:54 PM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 5/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/19/2024. (irw) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment (Pro Se)
Fri 04/19 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (lgm) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint - State Court
Fri 04/19 10:52 AM
ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Stephen Glasgow. (Kimmel, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint - State Court
Fri 04/19 10:49 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Stephen Glasgow, filed by Melvin Johnson. (lgm) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Correction
Fri 04/19 10:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE : Attorney S. Watson Turnipseed is not admitted to practice before this Court. (lgm) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stephen Glasgow from Circuit Court of Coahoma County, Mississippi, case number 14COI1 24cv005 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSNDC-2379299) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally. filed by Stephen Glasgow. (lgm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- State Court Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |