Suprise v. O'Malley
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William E Duffin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00466 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
socsec
Briefing Letter
Wed 05/01 2:04 PM
Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 7/1/2024 ; Plaintiff's brief due 7/31/2024 ; Defendant's response due 8/30/2024 ; Plaintiff's reply due 9/13/2024 . (cc: all counsel) (asc) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 04/30 12:55 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/30/2024. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/25 11:24 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Stephanie M Suprise. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chewning, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/24 1:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Martin J O'Malley. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 7:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Charles Yarnell on behalf of Martin J O'Malley. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Yarnell (Yarnell, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
socsec
Notice - Action Commenced
Tue 04/23 9:14 AM
Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (asc) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Mon 04/22 4:50 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/22/2024 GRANTING2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 2:06 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Stephanie M Suprise. (Chewning, Donald) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/19 2:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Stephanie M Suprise. (Chewning, Donald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Fri 04/19 1:59 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Stephanie M Suprise(Chewning, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Appeals Council denial, | ||
Att: 3 ALJ decision | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 04/19 2:05 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge William Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (mew) |