Flowers v. Tower Pallet Company Inc
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00465 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:14 PM CDT |
Defendant
Tower Pallet Company Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
George Flowers
1140 N Shawano St
New London, WI 54961 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/30 8:49 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by George Flowers. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kwf) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 04/25 9:00 AM
SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 4/24/24. Plaintiff's2 MOTION for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint submitted on 4/19/24, is DISMISSED. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before 5/24/24. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the action will be dismissed. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party with form and guide)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/19 1:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by George Flowers. (jmk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Fri 04/19 1:51 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tower Pallet Company Inc filed by George Flowers. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (jmk) |
|
Att: 1 Bookmarked Attachments |