Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.14.121.248
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Christine M Arguello |
Referred: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01069 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.14.121.248
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Wed 05/01 2:16 PM
ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to Serve aThird-Party Subpoena Before a Rule 26(f) Conference". Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/1/2024.(dgumb, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Memorandum
Tue 04/30 12:36 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Before a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/30/2024. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Leave
Tue 04/30 12:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Before a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Fernandez, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of David Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/22 7:18 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The Court will unilaterally set the trial on a Court Term Week within 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and the parties shall be available for trial accordingly. The Court's Term Weeks can be found under the "Judicial Officers" tab for Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on the District Courts homepage (https://www.cod.uscourts.gov). SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/22/2024. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Fri 04/19 3:55 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (efoga, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 04/19 3:54 PM
Case assigned to Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report re: Copyright
Fri 04/19 3:53 PM
Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (efoga, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 1:59 PM
NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(Fernandez, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 1:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Fernandez, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT - Action for Damages For Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.14.121.248 (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9646264)Attorney Jessica W. Fernandez added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Fernandez, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |