Burren v. Target Corporation
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01059 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Denver County District Court, 2024CV30348 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 2:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Burren
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/26 11:19 AM
ANSWER to7 Complaint by Target Corporation.(Chase, John) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Fri 04/19 1:49 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, ) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 04/19 1:48 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Order, Pre-Trial Order, and Discovery Protocol upon Target Corporation on 3/20/2024 (efoga, ) |
|
7 | 7
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:43 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Target Corporation, filed by Susan Burren.(efoga, ) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Fri 04/19 1:42 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 04/19 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane G. Michalakes-Gunning on behalf of Target CorporationAttorney Jane G. Michalakes-Gunning added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft) (Michalakes-Gunning, Jane) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement
Fri 04/19 12:06 PM
STATEMENT Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Defendant Target Corporation. (Chase, John) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 12:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Chase, John) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Target Corporation(Chase, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Susan Burren v. Target Corporation, Case Number 2024-cv-30348. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9645680), filed by Target Corporation.(Chase, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Colorado Secretary of State - Summary, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |