Hosmer v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., A Liberian Corporation et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21494 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 4:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
Adriatic DMC D.O.O.
|
|
Defendant
Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., A Liberian Corporation
|
|
Defendant
XYZ Defendant(s)
|
|
Plaintiff
Robyn Susan Hosmer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 05/03 2:59 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robyn Susan Hosmer. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. served on 4/24/2024, response/answer due 5/15/2024. (Gardana, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Parties
Mon 04/22 5:16 PM
ORDER that fictitious defendants, XYZ Defendant(s) is/are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to mark the case as CLOSED for administrative purposes only. Plaintiff is instructed to submit, every sixty days (60) days from the date of this Order, status reports advising of the status of service upon the foreign Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (wc) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued for Service Abroad
Mon 04/22 10:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Adriatic DMC D.O.O. (scn) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 10:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (scn) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/22 10:05 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT For Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17463509, filed by Robyn Susan Hosmer.(Gardana, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |