Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 1:24-cv-00203
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:3001 Federal Debt Collection Procedures Act
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2024 2:25 AM MDT
Defendant
Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc.
Represented By
Phillip J Collaer
Anderson Julian & Hull
contact info
Cody Lynn Morgan
Anderson, Julian & Hull, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr.
Represented By
Phillip J Collaer
Anderson Julian & Hull
contact info
Cody Lynn Morgan
Anderson, Julian & Hull, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Elliot Wertheim
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 07 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Amend (Dkt. 17) is GRANTED. Within seven days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a clean version of its first amended complaint. Defendants shall respond to the first amended complaint within 21 days of the date that complaint is filed. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 2:46 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL - In accordance with the Stipulation of Dismissal (ECF No.29 ) filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) and signed by all parties who have appeared in this action,the above-captioned action is automatically terminated in its entirety with prejudice. See Fed. R.Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A); Wilson v. City of San Jose, 111 F.3d 688, 692 (9th Cir. 1997) (Dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A) is automatic, without court order). The parties have agreed to bear their own attorneys fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/11 1:45 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by United States of America. (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/13 8:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES - The Court HEREBY ORDERS that the Stipulation (ECF No.27 ) is GRANTED and the case management deadlines are HERBY RESET as follows: ADR must be held by April 15, 2025. All dispositive motions, including motion for punitive damages, must be filed by April 4, 2025. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
27 27 misc Stipulation Wed 01/08 1:33 PM
STIPULATION Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Case Management Deadlines by United States of America. (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/17 9:31 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCLOSURE, DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DEADLINES - The Court HEREBY ORDERS that the Stipulation (ECF No.25 ) is GRANTED and the case management deadlines are HEREBY RESET as follows: All dispositive motions, including motion for punitive damages, must be filed by February 28, 2025. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation Fri 12/13 11:38 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Expert Disclosure, Dispositive Motions, and Discovery Cut-Off Deadlines by United States of America. (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/06 9:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER RE EXPERT TESTING - The Court HEREBY ORDERS that the Joint Stipulated Motion (ECF No.23 ) is GRANTED as follows: See attached. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation Thu 12/05 8:41 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order re Expert Testing by United States of America. (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
22 22 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Tue 11/26 3:49 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to First 21 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc., Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr.. (Collaer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/12 1:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc., Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr., filed by United States of America.(Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 order Order Fri 11/08 11:23 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER: Good cause appearing, the Court hereby approves the parties' stipulation, filed at Dkt. 19, to extend the deadline for fact discovery from November 8, 2024 to November 22, 2024. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 16) remain applicable. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mls))
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation Thu 11/07 1:43 PM
STIPULATION to Modify Scheduling Order by Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc., Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr.. (Collaer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/07 11:04 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Amend (Dkt.17 ) is GRANTED. Within seven days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a clean version of its first amended complaint. Defendants shall respond to the first amended complaint within 21 days of the date that complaint is filed. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
17 17 motion Leave to File Document Thu 10/10 2:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Elliot Wertheim appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 10/31/2024(Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint
Monday, July 22, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 11:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the following recitation of deadlines and procedures will govern this litigation: All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must be filed by February 14, 2025. Motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, must be filed on or before October 11, 2024. The parties have chosen to participate in a judicially supervised settlement conference. ADR must be held by January 10, 2025. All fact discovery must be completed by November 8, 2024. The Court will conduct a telephonic interim status conference on October 10, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
utility Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents Tue 07/16 11:44 AM
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
15 15 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Thu 07/11 3:27 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc., Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr.. (Collaer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Discovery Plan Thu 07/11 3:26 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN by Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc., Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr. . (Collaer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
13 13 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Wed 07/10 11:44 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by United States of America. (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Discovery Plan Wed 07/10 11:43 AM
DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America . (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Wed 07/10 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc. re.10 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/9/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/09 3:17 PM
Defendant Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc..(Collaer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 misc Consent Filed Wed 07/03 5:42 PM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ac)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/10 9:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc. waiver sent on 5/7/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
7 7 order Litigation Order Tue 05/21 5:28 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on July 18, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before July 11, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Thu 05/16 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr., United States of America re. dkt.1 Complaint, dkt.5 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/15/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/15 3:16 PM
Defendant Mellow's ANSWER to1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr..(Collaer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/25 9:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr. served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/22 10:16 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.)(ac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 order Order Mon 04/22 9:11 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Number Change Mon 04/22 9:44 AM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:24-cv-00203-BLW (ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/19 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Idaho State Bowhunters, Inc., Manuel Edmond Mellow Jr., filed by United States of America.(Wertheim, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet