MAODI et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Carl J Nichols |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01146 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1605A Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
|
|
Plaintiff
SIVAN ELKABETZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAPIR KITAYEVICH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHIMON MAODI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAMAR MAODI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHANI ROSENBERG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 1:08 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (znmw) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Randy D. Singer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Randy) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 1:07 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmw) Modified judge on 4/22/2024 (znmw) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Waiver
Fri 04/19 5:19 PM
MOTION for Waiver of Local Rule 5.1(c)(1) by SIVAN ELKABETZ, SAPIR KITAYEVICH, SHIMON MAODI, TAMAR MAODI, SHANI ROSENBERG.(Atty, Maryam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Allin Hoffman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoffman, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case
Fri 04/19 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:24cv284 (Atty, Maryam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10840171) filed by SHIMON MAODI, SIVAN ELKABETZ, SHANI ROSENBERG, TAMAR MAODI, SAPIR KITAYEVICH.(Atty, Maryam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |