Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Brian J Davis |
Referred: | Patricia D Barksdale |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00382 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:09 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Counter Defendant
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/02 12:17 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Subpoena | ||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Copyright Report
Tue 04/30 3:27 PM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (GL) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 2:04 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/23 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christian W. Waugh on behalf of Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Lead Counsel: Christian W. Waugh. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/22 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Judicial Assistant). (AMP) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Copyright Report
Mon 04/22 11:58 AM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (GL) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/22 11:47 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 4:34 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:24-cv-382-BJD-PDB. (AA) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/19 2:27 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 04/19 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22003319), COUNTERCLAIM against John Doe Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |