Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00738 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 2:14 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Copyright Report
Tue 04/23 11:48 AM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (LD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 04/23 8:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/23/2024. (MEH) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 8:40 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/23/2024. (MEH) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 1:32 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-738-CEM-LHP. (RLK) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/19 3:47 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22004017) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |