Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywel |
Referred: | Christopher P Tuite |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00953 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 2:19 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Copyright Report
Tue 04/23 2:32 PM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (MCB) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/22 2:29 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/22 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 2:15 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-953-CEH-CPT. (TNP) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/19 4:22 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22004402) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |