Perez v. MODIVCARE INC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21499 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Xabely Alfonso
|
|
Defendant
LOGISTICA X LLC
|
|
Defendant
MODIVCARE INC
|
|
Plaintiff
Ahmed Perez
Remer, Georges-Pierre & Hoogerwoerd, PLLC 2745 Ponce de Leon Blvd
Coral Gables, FL 33134 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Mon 04/22 7:35 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $405.00, receipt #AFLSDC-17464158, case filed date: 4/19/2024. No further entries will be made on this case . (bb) |